KS SB435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the use of personal package delivery devices on sidewalks and crosswalks, exempting such devices from motor vehicle regulation and preempting additional municipal regulation.
Title
Providing for the use of personal package delivery devices on sidewalks and crosswalks, exempting such devices from motor vehicle regulation and preempting additional municipal regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |