KS SB434 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the practice of hair removal by sugaring from the definition of cosmetology.
Title
Exempting the practice of hair removal by sugaring from the definition of cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 71 Nay: 52 (Y: 71 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 71 Nay: 52 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2024-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |