KS SB431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing extent of property tax exemption from the statewide school levy for residential property to $100,000 of its appraised valuation.
Title
Increasing extent of property tax exemption from the statewide school levy for residential property to $100,000 of its appraised valuation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |