KS SB429 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Delaying certain provisions of the scrap metal theft reduction act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delaying certain provisions of the scrap metal theft reduction act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2018-03-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-03-28SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2018-03-23SenateSenate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S
2018-02-22SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback