KS SB428 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changing licensure requirements for a child care facility operating in a public recreation center or school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing licensure requirements for a child care facility operating in a public recreation center or school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-04-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2018
2018-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Seniors
2018-03-22HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 22, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N
2018-03-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
2018-03-16HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-03-15SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-03-01SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2018-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-02-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback