KS SB427 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reviewing and continuing expiring exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reviewing and continuing expiring exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-02-14SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback