KS SB427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Senate Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 17 Nay: 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Kansas expanded lottery act regarding racetrack gaming facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Kansas expanded lottery act regarding racetrack gaming facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 17 Nay: 20 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 17 Nay: 20
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was adopted
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-04-27SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-04-03SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, April 03, 2018, 08:00 AM Room 142-S
2018-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-02-20SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback