KS SB424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending certain provisions regarding business entities and business filings with the secretary of state, including business name, certain addresses, making revisions to certain statutory citations and extending the effective date of certain provisions pertaining to series of a limited liability company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending certain provisions regarding business entities and business filings with the secretary of state, including business name, certain addresses, making revisions to certain statutory citations and extending the effective date of certain provisions pertaining to series of a limited liability company.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2020-02-12SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback