KS SB423 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 423 by Select Committee on Education Finance-Amending the Kansas school equity and enhancement act and making appropriations to the department of education.
Title
Substitute for SB 423 by Select Committee on Education Finance-Amending the Kansas school equity and enhancement act and making appropriations to the department of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 21 Nay: 19 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to call the question adopted. - Yea: 21 Nay: 16 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to nonconcur and appoint a conference was rejected. - Yea: 17 Nay: 21 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 56 (Y: 63 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 75 (Y: 43 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 78 (Y: 41 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Patton Amendment Part 3 Adopted. - Yea: 76 Nay: 44 (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 21 Nay: 18 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to call the question adopted. - Yea: 21 Nay: 16 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to nonconcur and appoint a conference was rejected. - Yea: 17 Nay: 21 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 56 (Y: 63 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected - Yea: 43 Nay: 75 (Y: 43 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 78 (Y: 41 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Patton Amendment Part 3 Adopted. - Yea: 76 Nay: 44 (Y: 76 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 21 Nay: 18 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 21 Nay: 19 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to call the question adopted. Yea: 21 Nay: 16 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to nonconcur and appoint a conference was rejected. Yea: 17 Nay: 21 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-07 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 63 Nay: 56 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected Yea: 43 Nay: 75 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Trimmer was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 78 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Trimmer |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Patton Amendment Part 3 Adopted. Yea: 76 Nay: 44 |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Patton Amendment Part 2 Adopted. vote_tally |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Patton Amendment Part 1 Adopted. vote_tally |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Trimmer requested the motion to amend by Representative Patton be divided. The amendment was ruled divisible and divided into 3 parts. |
2018-04-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Patton |
2018-04-07 | House | House Motion by Rep. Hineman to advance bill to Emergency Final Action Subject to Amendment and Debate and suspend Joint Rule 4(k) adopted. |
2018-04-07 | House | House Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 18 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 548-S |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |