KS SB417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor by a class A club to nonmembers of such club at special events.
Title
Authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor by a class A club to nonmembers of such club at special events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |