KS SB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Depositing all state sales tax revenues from sales on the Kansas state fairgrounds into the state fair capital improvements fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Depositing all state sales tax revenues from sales on the Kansas state fairgrounds into the state fair capital improvements fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 2 (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 16, 2018
2018-05-04SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018
2018-05-03SenateSenate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-04-30HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees
2018-04-30SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Tyson , Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland as conferees
2018-04-30SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-28HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 2
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Becker was adopted
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Becker
2018-04-28HouseHouse Representative Ward raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
2018-04-28HouseHouse Representative Ward raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer
2018-04-28HouseHouse Representative Schroeder raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2018-04-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2018-03-29HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-03-29HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-03-29SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Berger was adopted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Berger
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-03-12SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S
2018-02-09SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2018-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb415/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_04_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb415_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180329132155_777162/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180428135653_217831/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180503115020_556118/

Bill Comments

feedback