KS SB414 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 414 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Updating egg repacking requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 414 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Updating egg repacking requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 20, 2018
2018-03-16SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-13HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-03-05HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N
2018-02-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2018-02-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-22SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S
2018-02-09SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback