KS SB410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating captive insurance statutes and providing for association and branch captive insurance companies and special purpose insurance captives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating captive insurance statutes and providing for association and branch captive insurance companies and special purpose insurance captives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 15 (Y: 109 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
2018-04-06SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2018
2018-04-03SenateSenate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-03-29HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
2018-03-28SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees
2018-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 15
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2018-03-15HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
2018-03-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED
2018-02-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2018-02-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-22SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2018-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S
2018-02-09SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2018-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback