KS SB41 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the crimes of assault of a public transportation employee and battery against a public transportation employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the crimes of assault of a public transportation employee and battery against a public transportation employee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2017-01-20SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-19SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback