KS SB409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating statutory procedures and limitations concerning contact with jurors.
Title
Creating statutory procedures and limitations concerning contact with jurors.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Pettey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |