KS SB407 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating income eligibility requirements for the state children's health insurance program.
Title
Updating income eligibility requirements for the state children's health insurance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |