KS SB404 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a process to terminate the parental rights of a person whose sexual assault of another has resulted in the conception of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a process to terminate the parental rights of a person whose sexual assault of another has resulted in the conception of a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2020-03-10HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-02-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback