KS SB404 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the state board of regents on behalf of Kansas state university to sell certain real property in Riley county, Kansas.
Title
Authorizing the state board of regents on behalf of Kansas state university to sell certain real property in Riley county, Kansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Introduced |