KS SB395 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to intestate succession.
Title
Relating to intestate succession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-17 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-16 | Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced |