KS SB39 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 13, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directing the capitol preservation committee to develop and approve plans for a mural honoring the 1st Kansas (Colored) Voluntary Infantry regiment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the capitol preservation committee to develop and approve plans for a mural honoring the 1st Kansas (Colored) Voluntary Infantry regiment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 13, 2023
2023-03-06SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 6, 2023
2023-03-02HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2023-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2023-02-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military
2023-02-16HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
2023-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2023-02-10HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2023-02-09SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2023-01-31SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2023-01-25SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2023-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2023-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/sb39/
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/sb39_00_0000.pdf
Texthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/sb39_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_sb39_s_0846.pdf
Amendmenthttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/cr_2023_sb39_h_1261.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb39_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/supp_note_sb39_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/documents/summary_sb_39_2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230209163321_686443/
Roll Callhttps://kslegislature.org/li/b2023_24/measures/vote_view/je_20230302112439_201524/

Bill Comments

feedback