KS SB388 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 15 Nay: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 15 Nay: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the state board of regents to adopt a policy on awarding credit hours based on CLEP test results.
Title
Requiring the state board of regents to adopt a policy on awarding credit hours based on CLEP test results.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 15 Nay: 25 (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 81 Nay: 32 (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 81 Nay: 32 (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 15 Nay: 25 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 81 Nay: 32 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-29 | House | House Representative Wilson replaces Representative Winn on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-29 | House | House Representative Boldra replaces Representative Lunn on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-29 | House | House Representative Schwartz replaces Representative Highland on the Conference Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Highland, Representative Lunn and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Abrams , Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley as conferees |
2016-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2016-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2016-03-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-03-11 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |