KS SB385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring registration as a sex offender for certain violations of the crimes of breach of privacy, internet trading in child pornography and aggravated internet trading in child pornography.
Title
Requiring registration as a sex offender for certain violations of the crimes of breach of privacy, internet trading in child pornography and aggravated internet trading in child pornography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 8, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |