KS SB385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2020 and FY 2021 for various state agencies.
Title
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2020 and FY 2021 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 4, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb385/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb385_00_0000.pdf |