KS SB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a Kansas foster care children annual academic report card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a Kansas foster care children annual academic report card.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2020-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2020-02-18SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2020-02-10SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2020-02-07SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback