KS SB378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the period for unemployment insurance benefit eligibility to 26 weeks for the next two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the period for unemployment insurance benefit eligibility to 26 weeks for the next two years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED
2020-03-12SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce
2020-03-12SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2020-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback