KS SB373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the crimes of selling sexual relations, promoting the sale of sexual relations and buying sexual relations by changing terminology from "sexual relations" to "a sex act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the crimes of selling sexual relations, promoting the sale of sexual relations and buying sexual relations by changing terminology from "sexual relations" to "a sex act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 20 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-26SenateSenate Senator Hilderbrand raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 20
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-17SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback