KS SB37 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Ethics, Elections and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; voting procedures where proof of citizenship not provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; voting procedures where proof of citizenship not provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
2017-01-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2017-01-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback