KS SB36 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Kansas highway patrol to make multiple vehicle checks within a set time period for certain salvage vehicle pools and allowing salvage vehicle pools and dealers to apply for ownership documents for vehicles that are disclaimed by insurance companies, prohibiting the towing vehicles outside the state of Kansas without prior consent, requiring an interstate search of registered owners and lienholders prior to sale of vehicles less than 15 years old and requiring publication in the newspaper seven days prior to sale of vehicles and property at auction.
Title
Requiring the Kansas highway patrol to make multiple vehicle checks within a set time period for certain salvage vehicle pools and allowing salvage vehicle pools and dealers to apply for ownership documents for vehicles that are disclaimed by insurance companies, prohibiting the towing vehicles outside the state of Kansas without prior consent, requiring an interstate search of registered owners and lienholders prior to sale of vehicles less than 15 years old and requiring publication in the newspaper seven days prior to sale of vehicles and property at auction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 4 (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 6 (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 4 (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 6 (Y: 116 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 4 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2021-03-25 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees |
2021-03-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, January 25, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |