KS SB355 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to labor and employment standards pertaining to accident prevention and the powers and duties of the secretary of labor regarding wage claims, labor disputes and workplace inspection.
Title
Amendments to labor and employment standards pertaining to accident prevention and the powers and duties of the secretary of labor regarding wage claims, labor disputes and workplace inspection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on General Orders | |
2012-02-29 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-15 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/sb355/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/sb355_00_0000.pdf |