KS SB354 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mistreatment of an elder person or dependent adult.
Title
Mistreatment of an elder person or dependent adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |