KS SB353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the boiler inspection fee fund; transferring balances to the fire marshal fee fund.
Title
Abolishing the boiler inspection fee fund; transferring balances to the fire marshal fee fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |