KS SB35 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the option of extension of the time for receipt of advance mail ballots after the third day following an election.
Title
Removing the option of extension of the time for receipt of advance mail ballots after the third day following an election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |