KS SB348 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the practice of threading from the practice of cosmetology.
Title
Exempting the practice of threading from the practice of cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 32 Nay: 6 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 110 Nay: 10 (Y: 110 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 110 Nay: 10 (Y: 110 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 32 Nay: 6 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. appointed as conferees |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Hilderbrand , Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey as conferees |
2022-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 10 |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 7, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Introduced |