KS SB344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the requirement to photograph vehicles in the scrap metal theft reduction act.
Title
Removing the requirement to photograph vehicles in the scrap metal theft reduction act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb344/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb344_00_0000.pdf |