KS SB339 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for sales of food and food ingredients, providing for the levying of taxes by cities and counties and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Title
Providing a 0% state rate for sales and use taxes for sales of food and food ingredients, providing for the levying of taxes by cities and counties and discontinuing the nonrefundable food sales tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |