KS SB339 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the state corporation commission to approve certain electric contract rates and associated cost recovery from all rate classes.
Title
Allowing the state corporation commission to approve certain electric contract rates and associated cost recovery from all rate classes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2020-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2020-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |