KS SB335 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drug screening and substance abuse treatment programs for certain government officers and employees.
Title
Drug screening and substance abuse treatment programs for certain government officers and employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Smith [R] | Sen. Tom Arpke [R] | Sen. Jim Denning [R] | Sen. Robert Olson [R] |
Sen. Mary Pilcher-Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 4 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-03-20 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 4 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Education and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Rereferred to Committee on Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 07, 2014, 10:00 AM Room 144-S |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |