KS SB333 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying criminal procedures relating to a defendant's competency or incompetency to stand trial.
Title
Modifying criminal procedures relating to a defendant's competency or incompetency to stand trial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |