KS SB331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Flint Hills trail state park and Little Jerusalem Badlands state park as part of the state park system and establishing the Flint Hills advisory council.
Title
Designating Flint Hills trail state park and Little Jerusalem Badlands state park as part of the state park system and establishing the Flint Hills advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 96 Nay: 23 (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 99 Nay: 24 (Y: 99 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 96 Nay: 23 (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 99 Nay: 24 (Y: 99 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 01, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 96 Nay: 23 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hoffman, Representative Thompson and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Estes and Senator Francisco as conferees |
2018-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 99 Nay: 24 |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Corbet was rejected |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Corbet |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lusker was adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lusker |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Baker was adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Baker |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 14 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |