KS SB33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying the conditions under which a small employer carrier may establish certain classes of business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifying the conditions under which a small employer carrier may establish certain classes of business.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback