KS SB329 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the uniform partition of heirs property act.
Title
Enacting the uniform partition of heirs property act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb329/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb329_00_0000.pdf |