KS SB328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the outsourcing or privatization of any operations or facilities of any correctional institution or juvenile correctional facility; allowing existing contracts to be renewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the outsourcing or privatization of any operations or facilities of any correctional institution or juvenile correctional facility; allowing existing contracts to be renewed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 114 Nay: 7 (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 111 Nay: 13 (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 8, 2018
2018-05-04SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 07, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-05-02SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 7
2018-05-01HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-02HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Jennings, Representative Whitmer and Representative Highberger appointed as conferees
2018-04-02SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees
2018-03-29HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 111 Nay: 13
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was adopted
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2018-03-07HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S
2018-02-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2018-02-21HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-21SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-02-07SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2018-01-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2018-01-24SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback