KS SB327 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding separately stated delivery charges from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Title
Excluding separately stated delivery charges from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 1, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2022-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2022-02-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |