KS SB326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the age for eligibility to renew drivers' licenses online to 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the age for eligibility to renew drivers' licenses online to 65.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2020-03-10HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2020-02-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-19HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-18SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2020-02-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2020-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-01-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-28SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback