KS SB326 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 09 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 09 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing production limits for microbreweries.
Title
Increasing production limits for microbreweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 10 (Y: 111 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 10 (Y: 115 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 10 (Y: 111 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 10 (Y: 115 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 09 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 03, 2016 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 10 |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Pauls, Representative Todd and Representative Tietze appointed as conferees |
2016-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Ostmeyer , Senator LaTurner and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2016-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 10 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2016-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 21, 2016, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |