KS SB322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making exemption permanent for certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles and excluding discounts and coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Title
Making exemption permanent for certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles and excluding discounts and coupons from the sales or selling price for sales tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-03-17 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 2 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 24, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 152-S |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |