KS SB32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting certain non-insurance healthcare benefits from the commissioner's jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting certain non-insurance healthcare benefits from the commissioner's jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 24 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Challenge of the Chair - Ruling was Sustained - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-21HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-20SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 24
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley
2019-02-20SenateSenate Challenge of the Chair - Ruling was Sustained Yea: 28 Nay: 12
2019-02-20SenateSenate Senator Baumgardner raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-29SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback