KS SB319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that bond agents seeking discharge as a surety are required to return the person released on bond to the court in the county where the complaint subject to the bond was filed.
Title
Clarifying that bond agents seeking discharge as a surety are required to return the person released on bond to the court in the county where the complaint subject to the bond was filed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |