KS SB317 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permitting a prosecution for childhood sexual abuse to be commenced at any time, extending the time to file civil actions for recovery of damages caused by childhood sexual abuse and providing exceptions in the Kansas tort claims act for claims arising from such abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting a prosecution for childhood sexual abuse to be commenced at any time, extending the time to file civil actions for recovery of damages caused by childhood sexual abuse and providing exceptions in the Kansas tort claims act for claims arising from such abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30SenateSenate Died in Committee
2023-03-23SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 23, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2023-03-17SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-03-16SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback