KS SB315 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring child care facilities, elementary, secondary and postsecondary educational institutions and employers to grant exemptions from vaccine requirements without inquiring into the sincerity of the request and repealing the meningitis vaccine requirement to live in student housing.
Title
Requiring child care facilities, elementary, secondary and postsecondary educational institutions and employers to grant exemptions from vaccine requirements without inquiring into the sincerity of the request and repealing the meningitis vaccine requirement to live in student housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |